Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Palisades Collection Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Layman, Patrick James, against Zimmerman, Marilyn J And Marital Community, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2007 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Release 14: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; SECURITY STATE BANK; |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 13: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 12: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Application 11: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Application 9: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 10: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 8: ORDER OF DEFAULT & DEFAULT JUDGMENT; JUDGE H. JOHN HALL; |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cost Bill 4: COST BILL; |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Certification 5: CERTIFICATION RE ATTY FEES; |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons 1: SUMMONS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.