Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Heritage Restoration Inc, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Zandell, Trevor Arthur, against Washington Mutual Bank, Strid, Julius M, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2007 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 38: STIP & AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
May 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Settlement and Removal from Arbitration Calendar 37: ARB STTLMNT & REMOVAL FROM ARB CAL; |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance HEARING STRICKEN:IN COURT NONAPPEAR; |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motions MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing Continued Stipulated 36: HEARING CONTINUED: STIPULATED; 05-16-2008M; MOTION TO COMPEL; |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motions MOTION TO COMPEL CONFIRM 5/7 MCKERRICHER ST |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 35: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motions MOTION TO COMPEL CONFIRM 4/23 MCKERRICHER ST |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing Continued Stipulated 34: HEARING CONTINUED: STIPULATED; 05-09-2008M; MOTION TO COMPEL; CONFIRM 5/7 MCKERRICHER ST; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.