Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Mutual Auto Ins Co, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Villager, Kristine R, against Pyles, Ashley And Marital Community, represented by Mano, Joseph M. Jr, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2007 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Other 9: OPINION; |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Award 8: ARBITRATION AWARD; |
|
May 09, 2007 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF ARBITRABILITY; | |
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Assignments ARB SET? |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability 7: NT FOR TRIAL & STMNT OF ARBITRABIL; 05-04-2007A; ARB SET?; |
|
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Assignments ARB SET? |
|
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 5: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE -SERVED; |
|
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability 6: NT FOR TRIAL & STMNT OF ARBITRABIL; 03-15-2007A; ARB SET?; |
|
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer 4: DEF ANSWER TO PLA COMPLAINT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.