Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
R & D Investments Llc, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Tiller, Laurel Lee, against Benfield, Betty, Travis, John Doe, Heirs Of Betty Benfield, Heirs Of Leah & John Doe Travis, Travis, Leah, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2007 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment 12: JUDGMENT & DECREE; JUDGE H. JOHN HALL; |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 9: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE H. JOHN HALL; |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 10: FINDINGS OF FACT&CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; JUDGE H. JOHN HALL; |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 11: ORDER OF DEFAULT; JUDGE H. JOHN HALL; |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motions ORDER OF DEFAULT *CONFIRMED 1/23 LTILLER* KW |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 8: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 7: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 01-26-2007M; ORDER OF DEFAULT; *CONFIRMED 1/23 LTILLER* KW; |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Publication 6: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; |
|
November 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order 5: ORDER DIRECTING SVC OF SUMM BY PUB; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.