Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Insurance Co, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Yarbro, Christopher S & Marital Community, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2007 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for order and subpoena |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice change of address |
|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel 8: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: THEILE, ERIC MICHAEL; |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Court Record to DOL 7: ABSTRACT OF COURT RECORD TO DOL; |
|
October 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 6: ORDER OF DEFAULT & JUDGMENT; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
October 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 5: DECLARATION OF SUM CERTAIN; |
|
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 4: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
September 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 3: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE -SERVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.