Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Church, Melissa, Church, Mathew, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Howard & Son Excavating Llc, Howard, Larry W, Colonial American Casualty & Surety Of Maryland, Howard, Jane Doe, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2007 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 13: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk Dismissal Calendar | |
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 12: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; 04-15-2008CD; |
|
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 11: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 10: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 9: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 8: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 7: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
September 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 6: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.