Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bergmann, Cassandra Susann filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts with Scott R. Sparks presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2023 |
CategoryDic Dissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed COURT TO COUNSEL RE: MOTION FOR REVISION |
||
November 07, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
November 07, 2023 | Declaration of Mailing | ||
November 02, 2023 | Motion for Revision | ||
October 23, 2023 |
Restraining Order
Judge: Kirkham, James D |
||
October 23, 2023 |
Change Of Venue
Judge: Kirkham, James D |
||
October 23, 2023 |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Kirkham, James D |
||
October 23, 2023 |
Transmittal on Copy of Order EPD |
||
October 23, 2023 |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Kirkham, James D |
||
October 20, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit RSP TO MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.