Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Contreras, Rodrigo filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts with L. Candace Hooper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeL. Candace Hooper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2023 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Transmittal on Copy of Order / EPD |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection
Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Recusal of Judge / Commissioner James Kirkham Judge: Kirkham, James D |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Transmittal on Copy of Order / EPD |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Petition Motion for Protection (Amended) Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Transmittal on Copy of Order / EPD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.