Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cheesman, Roy D, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case against Deffinbaugh, Dr Zach, Porter, Fred, Assurance Healthcare & Counseling Center, represented by Norman, Eric Allen, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2020 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Federspiel, Doug L |
|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Federspiel, Doug L |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply of Defendants In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket RE-NOTE; MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Recusal of Judge
Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.