Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Laase, Cheryl, Laase, Matthew, Laase, Megan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anderson, Robert W, against Kasowski, Gary, Peoh Electric. Llc, represented by Throgmorton, Michael Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts with Scott R. Sparks presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott R. Sparks Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2020 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Sparks, Scott R |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.