Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Beatty, Bruce M, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Pollution Control Hearings Board, Washington Department Of Fish And Wildlife, Washington Fish And Wildlife Commission, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipts 53: RECEIPT -THURSTON COUNTY; |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipts 52: RECEIPT -THURSTON COUNTY; |
|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 51: CORRESPONDENCE TO THURSTON CO; |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 50: CORRESPONDENCE TO THURSTON CO; |
|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Letter Re Exhibits/Depositions 49: CLERK'S LETTER RE EXBTS/DEPS; EXHIBITS RETURNED FROM COA; ---------------------------; ALL PREVIOUS DOCUMENTS EXCEPT; THE ORIGINAL #47 SENT TO; THURSTON COUNTY PER ORDER; ---------------------------; |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition 48: 2ND AMENDED PETITION FOR JUDICIAL; REVIEW; |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for Change of Venue 47: ORDER FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion 46: MOTION TO AMEND PETITION AND; TRANSFER VENUE TO THURSTON COUNTY; |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 45: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; |
|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel 44: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.