Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fia Card Services, N.A., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer, P.S., against Danubio, Tony A, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2011 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Release 20: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay Regarding Bankruptcy 19: NOTICE OF STAY RE: BANKRUPTCY; |
|
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 18: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 17: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order 16: ORDER REGARDING JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 15: MOTION AND DECLARATION FOR ORDER; REGARDING JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 14: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 13: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF; GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT; |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 12: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion 11: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT & ORDER TO PAY; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.