Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Farm Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Osterman, Peter Russell, against Shoaf, Jane Doe H W, Shoaf, Theodore, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2011 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 16: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 15: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 14: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order 13: ORDER FOR JUDICIAL SUBPOENA TO; EMPLOYMENT SECURITY RECORDS; |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 12: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; FOR ORDER FOR SUBPOENA; |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order 11: ORDER DIRECTING ANSWERS TO; INTERROGATORIES; |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 10: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; FOR ORDER DIRECTING ANSWERS TO; INTERROGATORIES; |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit 8: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT; |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.