Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Banbuskirk, Katrina, Vanbuskirk, Terry, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Barton, Jerry, represented by Slothower, Jeffrey David, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2011 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 12: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 11: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 10: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 9: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 8: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 7: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Complaint 5: COMPLAINT; |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons 6: SUMMONS; |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 4: ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.