Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcgrew, Alexandria Janeice, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Safly, Matthew John, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryDin Dissolution Of Marriage With No Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Contempt 3/25/22 @ 9:00 DOMESTIC - REVIEW Judge: Forbes, Jennifer A |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Contempt Hearing CONTEMPT FOUND/ ORDER SIGNED & REVIEW SET Judge: Forbes, Jennifer A |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause/Contempt
Judge: Forbes, Jennifer A |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing MOTION GRANTED / ORDER SIGNED / SHOW CAUSE SET 1/21/22 @9AM Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 1/21/22 AT 9AM - DOMESTIC RELATIONS - CONTEMPT Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause/Contempt
Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 12/10/21 AT 9AM - DOMESTIC RELATIONS - CONTEMPT HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.