Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mcgannon, John Joseph filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Tina Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2020 |
CategoryPps Parenting Plan/Child Support |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intended Relocation of Children | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition
Judge: Robinson, Tina |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Mot to Limit Ntc of Intent to Move with Children Ex Parte | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing COURT DENIES MOTION Judge: Robinson, Tina |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte
Judge: Robinson, Tina |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Robinson, Tina |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CONTEMPT Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 4/12/22 @ 9:00 PARENTAGE - MOTION FOR CONTEMPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.