Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fisher, Cameron, Fisher, Suzanne, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Fisher, Megan, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Tina Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2019 |
CategoryGdn Guardianship |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Delinquency 36M ACCOUNTING (1) REPORT PERIOD: 05/31/2020-05/30/2023 |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing ORDER SIGNED AS PRESENTED Judge: Robinson, Tina |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing MOTION TO PLACE RESTRICTIONS ON INDVIDUAL Judge: Robinson, Tina |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Sealed Personal Health Care Records Cover Sheet | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit RE FEES & COSTS |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 01/20/23 @ 9AM MOTION TO PLACE RESTRICTIONS ON INDVIDUAL |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Delinquency 12M ACCOUNTING (1) REPORT PERIOD: 05/31/2019-05/30/2020 *IF NOT APPROVED 09/11/2020* Judge: Hull, Kevin D |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters of Guardianship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.