Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Todd Welsh, April Umbi filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2019 |
CategoryDic Dissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default
Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken Not Confirmed and Not Heard | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence FROM COURT OF APPEALS RE DISCRETIONARY REVIEW |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing MATTER STRICKEN; MATTER TO BE RE-NOTE AFTER DECISION FROM SUPREME COURT/APPEAL Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing FOR RECUSAL Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed NOTICE OF APPEAL TO COURT OF APPEALS DIV II |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed /NOTICE OF APPEAL TO SUPREME COURT |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion TO CHANGE VENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.