Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Otto, Olivia, filed a(n) case against Walker, Jane Doe, Walker, Casey, represented by Shapland, Sara Renae, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2019 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2022 |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing COURT GRANTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT / SIGNS ORDER Judge: Robinson, Tina |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF'S Judge: Robinson, Tina |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment DEFENDANT'S SEEKING DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Unclaimed | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Preassignment JUDGE ROBINSON 02/25/2022 1:30 PM. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Hull, Kevin D |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment SEEKING DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 02/25/2022 1:30 PM SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.