Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Land Title Company Of Kitsap County I, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Dietz, Jill, Jones, Wilburn O, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2019 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Unclaimed | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter RE FUNDS FROM CLERK TO DEFENDANTS |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT -INTERPLEADER; |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipts RECEIPT(S); |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.