Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cotes, Charles Roger, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Harris, Brandy Lynn, Paiva, Alfred K, All Other Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS; UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 5: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFF OF SERVICE /RACHELLE KAMMERER; |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DET; |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Verification 3: VERIFICATION RCW 59.18.375; |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.