Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cedar Park Apartments Bremerton Apartments Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Harris, Leyna, against Mcdermott, Wendy, Olson, Jeanette, Any Other Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN, UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER; |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Harris, Leyna; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.