Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cotes, Charles Roger, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Harris, Brandee, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS; UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 4: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 3: AFF OF SERVICE SUMMONS ON B HARRIS; |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DET; |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; PRO-SE ATTY FOR PLA/PET: COTES, CHARLES ROGER; | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.