Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Razor Capital Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Vos, Ryan Earl, against Peterson, John Doe, Peterson, Laureena, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Melissa A. Hemstreet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelissa A. Hemstreet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service by Mail 29: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel 28: NOTICE WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUT COUNSEL; |
|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 27: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter 26: LETTER FROM DSHS; |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 25: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 23: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.