Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fine, William, Herbert, Annemarie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rovang, W. David, against Obrien, Jane Doe, Obrien, Shawn, represented by Lanthorn, Jeffery Richard, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Sally F. Olsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSally F. Olsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 12: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; JUDGE SALLY F. OLSEN, DEPT 8; |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Litigant 11: ORDER DISMISSING LITIGANTS WILCOX; JUDGE JENNIFER A. FORBES, DEPT 7; |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer 10: ANSWER OF SCOTT AND KENDAL WILCOX; |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice 9: NOTICE STRIKING FROM TRIAL SET CAL; |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
T Trial Setting Calendar ARBITRATION SETTING |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED -ARB SETTING; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Rovang, W. David; | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Statement of Arbitrability 8: STATEMENT OF ARBITRABILITY; 03-11-2016T; ARBITRATION SETTING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.