Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mercado, Christopher Jason, against Conroy, John Doe, Conroy, Katie, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Jennifer A. Forbes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer A. Forbes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 22: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); 15-9-02155-6; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: ALASKA USA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION , NFN; |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 21: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 19: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 20: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); 15-9-02155-6; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: VCA ANIMAL HOSPITALS INC , NFN; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.