Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Elrod, Lori, against Rice, Derek E, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin D. Hull presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin D. Hull Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 7: SATISFACTION JUDGMENT 16-9-00925-2; |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment 6: JUDGMENT STIPULATED 16-9-00925-2; JUDGE KEVIN D. HULL, DEPT 6; |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer 5: ANSWER - DEFENDANT DEREK RICE; |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFF OF SERVICE SUMMONS-DEREK RICE; |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Re Dependent of a Person in Military Service 3: NT RE: DEPENDENT OF MILITARY PERSON; |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FOR MONIES DUE; AND OWING; |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Elrod, Lori; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.