Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Puget Sound Energy Inc, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ryder, David Clay, against Against His Marital Community, Cornell, Tully J, represented by Olmstead, Thomas S., in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Matthew L. Clucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew L. Clucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Court Record to DOL | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS BY DEFENDANT Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit RODEL PAGULAYAN (OF PSE) |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER VACATING ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS BY DEFENDANT CORNELL |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 21: STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT OF; JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS; |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Agreement for Installment Payments 20: ORD APPROV AGREEMENT INSTALL PAYMNT; JUDGE JENNIFER A. FORBES, DEPT 7; |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 19: STIPULATION FOR PAYMENET OF JDGMNT; IN IN STALLMENTS BY DEF CORNELL; |
|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 18: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE KEVIN D. HULL, DEPT 6; COURT STRIKES W/O PREJUDICE TO; RENOTE; COURT REPORTER CARISA GROSSMAN; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.