Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Helm, Caitlin, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Durkin, John Joseph, against Lane, Jane Doe H W, Lane, Michael, Strack, John Doe H W, Strack, Samantha, represented by Sjursen, George Freeman, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with William C. Houser presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Houser Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2016 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 31: ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE; 03-07-2017; 9:00 AM 4 DAYS JUDGE HOUSER; |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SETTING; 12-02-2016; 2:30 PM 30 MINUTES; |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 42: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; 16-9-01852-9; |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment 41: JUDGMENT 16-9-01852-9; JUDGE WILLIAM C. HOUSER, DEPT 4; |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 39: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE WILLIAM C. HOUSER, DEPT 4; |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 40: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 38: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE WILLIAM C. HOUSER, DEPT 4; COURT SIGNS ORDERS; COURT REPORTER CARISA GROSSMAN; |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
WH Hon William Houser ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CR68 |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection Opposition 37: DEF OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; |
|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 36: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 10-14-2016WH; ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CR68; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.