Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lee, Thomas James, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Hunt, Joseph Taylor, against Lee, Kerry M, Osborne, Garrett, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Jennifer A. Forbes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer A. Forbes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw AND CONSENT TO SUBSTITUTION |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay Regarding Bankruptcy | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint FOR BREACH OF IMPLIED SURETY AGREEMENT; EXONERATION; UNJUST ENRICHMENT; ETC. |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision : ORDER GRANING DEFS' SM JD MOTION IN PART AND DENYING SM JD AS TO REMAINING CLAIMS Judge: Forbes, Jennifer A |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing COPIES OF ORDERS |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision : ORDER DENYING PLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT OSBORNE Judge: Forbes, Jennifer A |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision : ORDER GRANTING PLA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT Judge: Forbes, Jennifer A |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment ALSO MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT Judge: Forbes, Jennifer A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.