Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Simpson, Hannah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Morgan, Danica Dawn, against Woodworth, Dewitt, Woodworth, Jane Doe, represented by Sjursen, George Freeman, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Melissa A. Hemstreet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelissa A. Hemstreet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2015 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 17: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE MELISSA A HEMSTREET, DEPT3; |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 16: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; |
|
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice 15: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME; |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 14: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE NT; |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice 13: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME; |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 12: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE NT; |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 11: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Sjursen, George Freeman; |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Transferring to Mandatory Arbitration 10: ORD TRANSFER. MANDATORY ARBITRATION; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.