Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fischer Painting Inc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against J Hanson Construction Inc, Philadelphia Indemnity Insuranc, represented by Yusen, Jeff H., in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2019 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney 4: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY; |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Notice 5: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE; |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 3: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; |
|
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
|
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; NORBUT, GREGORY P.; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.