Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hammond, Connie E H W, Hammond, James D, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Uhlig, Michael Dean, against Young, Deborah, Young, Deborah W, Young, Stephen M, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with William C. Houser presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Houser Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2015 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 33: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; JUDGE WILLIAM C. HOUSER, DEPT 4; |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 28: NOTICE OF HEARING 9:00 AM; 10-25-2016; MOTION IN LIMINE JUDGE HULL; |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 16: ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE 9:00 AM; 10-25-2016; |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date 32: NT STLMT/AUTH CLRK STRK TRIAL DATE; |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Joint Statement of Evidence 30: JOINT STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE; |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 29: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: UHLIG, MICHAEL DEAN; |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 31: DCLR RE SIGNATURE ON ELECTRONIC; DOCUMENT-JOINT STATEMENT EVIDENCE; |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 28: NOTICE OF HEARING 9:00 AM; 10-25-2016; MOTION IN LIMINE JUDGE HULL; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.