Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Larsen, Scott Anthony filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Jeanette Dalton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeanette Dalton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2015 |
CategoryHar Unlawful Harassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision After Trial | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List 24: EXHIBIT LIST; |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Return of Exhibits and or Unopen 25: STIP&OR RET EXHBTS UNOPNED DEPOSTNS; JUDGE JEANETTE DALTON, DEPT 1; |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CD RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS RM 206; | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CD RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS RM 268; | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 20: ORD REISSUING TEMP PROTECTION ORDER; 02-23-2015; UNLAWFUL HARRASSMENT ORDER; 9AM SPECIAL SET; COMMISSIONER THURMAN LOWANS; |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NonJury Trial 23: NON-JURY TRIAL; JUDGE JEANETTE DALTON, DEPT 1; ORDER OR HARRASSMENT DENIED; |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 21: DECLARATION OF RESPONDENT; |
|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 22: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CD RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS #206; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.