Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Applegate, Terri filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Sally F. Olsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSally F. Olsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2015 |
CategoryVap Vulnerable Adult Protection Order |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy of Death Certificate 40: CERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE; |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition Motion to Modify 38: PETITION/MOTION TO MODIFY; |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Modifying Terminating Terms of Protective Order 39: ORD MOD/TRM TERMS OF PROT ORD; DISMISSED; JUDGE SALLY F. OLSEN, DEPT 8; |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order 37: ORDER APPROVING GAL FEES AND COSTS; JUDGE KEVIN D. HULL, DEPT 6; |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
P Probate GUARDIANSHIP |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 36: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE KEVIN D. HULL, DEPT 6; COURT SIGNS ORDER AS PRESENTED; COURT REPORTER JAMI HETZEL; |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Sealed Personal Health Care Records Cover Sheet 35A: SEALED PRSNL HEALTH RCDS CVR SHEET; |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 35B: DECLARATION OF GAL FEES - AMENDED; |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 35: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 09-11-2015P; GUARDIANSHIP; |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 34: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.