Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Peoples Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Hade, Kellen Andrew, against Hamilton, Susan M, Hamilton, John E, represented by Bagwell, Kenneth W, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin D. Hull presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin D. Hull Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 6: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE KEVIN D. HULL, DEPT 6; |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX; X CLOSED - NO FURTHER PLEADINGS X; XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX; |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 5: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 4: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 3: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF; PROMISSORY NOTE; |
|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Hade, Kellen Andrew; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.