Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sullivan, Kelly, Sullivan, James, filed a(n) Lca Lower Court Appeal - Civil case represented by Memovich, Greg Stephen, against Carpenter, Charlene B, represented by Andrews, John Claire, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin D. Hull presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin D. Hull Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2015 |
CategoryLca Lower Court Appeal - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 14: TRANSMITTAL LETTER - COPY FILED; ORDER OF DISMISSAL EMAILED TO; DISTRICT COURT; XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX; X CLOSED - NO FURTHER PLEADINGS X; XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX; |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 13: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE KEVIN D. HULL, DEPT 6; |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 12: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Brief 11: BRIEF RESPONDENT; |
|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 10: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Andrews, John Claire; |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 9: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.