Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Sloan, Linda, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2011 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exemption Claim 11: EXEMPTION CLAIM; |
|
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 10: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 9: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); 11-9-02839-6; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: BANK OF AMERICA , NFN; |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 8: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER THURMAN LOWANS; |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment 7: JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION; |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 6: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 5: DECLARATION REGARDING COSTS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.