Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Juhl, Nicholas William, against Smith, Jane Doe, Smith, Eric W, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin D. Hull presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin D. Hull Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2015 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX; X CLOSED - NO FURTHER PLEADINGS X; XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX; |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal 7: CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE KEVIN D. HULL, DEPT 6; |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 6: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report 5: REPORT STATUS; |
|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 4: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
August 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 3: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
August 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.