Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
P S C Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Adams, Barton Louis, against Siebert, William F, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2011 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 26: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 25: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 24: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 23: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 22: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 21: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 20: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 19: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 17: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 18: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.