Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bauer, Lydia Olive filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Russell W. Hartman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRussell W. Hartman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2011 |
CategoryVap Vulnerable Adult Protection Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 10: RETURN OF SERVICE 04 11 11 - RESP; MOHAVE CO BRIGES; |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
P Probate ORDER FOR PROTECTION RTS 03 30 11 AZ KCSO TO ENTER |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection 9: ORD FOR PROTECTION; JUDGE THEODORE F SPEARMAN DEPT 4; |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 8: MOTION HEARING; PETITION GRANTED, ORDER SIGNED; AS PRESENTED; JUDGE THEODORE F SPEARMAN DEPT 4; COURT REPORTER CARISA GROSSMAN; |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 7: RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Response 6: RESPONSE - RESP; |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 5: RETURN OF SERVICE 03 29 11 - VA; PRIVATE; |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Temporary Vulnerable Adult Protection Order 3: TEMP VULNERABLE ADULT PROTECT ORDER; 04-08-2011P; JUDGE RUSSELL W. HARTMAN, DEPT 6; ORDER FOR PROTECTION; RTS 03 30 11 AZ; KCSO TO ENTER; |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition for Vulnerable Adult Protection Order 1: PET FOR VULNERABLE ADULT PROT ORDER; PRO-SE ATTY FOR PLA/PET: MILLER, VONI; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.