Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carlson, Julie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Koch, J. Michael, against Liberty Mutual Group Inc, represented by Marinelli, Mathew Dominic, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Steven B. Dixon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven B. Dixon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2011 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 11: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; JUDGE STEVEN DIXON, DEPT 4; |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 10: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: JOHNSON, CHALMERS CAREY; |
|
August 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 9: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Marinelli, Mathew Dominic; |
|
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 8: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: JOHNSON, CHALMERS CAREY; |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 7: NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL APPEARANCE; |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 6: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Marinelli, Mathew Dominic; |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 5: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.