Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Russell W. Hartman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRussell W. Hartman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2011 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Power of Attorney 9: POWERS OF ATTORNEY CERTIFIED COPY; |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order 8: AGREED ORDER OF JUSTIFICATION; JUDGE RUSSELL W. HARTMAN, DEPT 6; |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Report 7: REPORT OF PROSECUTING ATTORNEY OFC; |
|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer 5: ANSWER; |
|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit 6: AFFIDAVIT; |
|
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order 4: ORDER REQUIRING JUSTIFICATION; JUDGE RUSSELL W. HARTMAN, DEPT 6; |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 3: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition 2: PETITION FOR ORDER OF JUSTIFICATION; |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; PETITIONER: MCCORMICK, TIMOTHY J; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.