Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Smith, Donna J, against Lehuanani Lynet Curley, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Jeffrey P. Bassett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey P. Bassett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2011 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Judgment
Judge: Bassett, Jeffrey P |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion TO EXTEND JUDGMENT |
|
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 9: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 8: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); 11-9-00639-2; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION , NFN; |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 7: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 6: ORDER OF DEFAULT; |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER THURMAN LOWANS; |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.