Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, Issuer Of Discover Card, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Friedl, Laurie K, against Doe 1 And The Marital Community Composed Thereof, Faris, Jennifer L, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2011 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 19: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 18: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: BANK OF AMERICA , NFN; |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 17: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 16: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 15: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: WELLS FARGO BANK , NFN; |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 14: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 13: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 11: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 12: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK , NFN; |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 10: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PLAINTIFF; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.