Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gibbons & Associates Ps, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Gibbons, Steven V., against Wadsworth Lydia Jane, Wadsworth, Ray, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Jay B. Roof presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay B. Roof Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2010 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 37: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment 36: JUDGMENT *AMENDED; JUDGE JAY B ROOF, DEPT 5; |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 35: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Settlement and Removal from Arbitration Calendar 34: ARB STTLMNT & REMOVAL FROM ARB CAL; |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 32: DECLARATION OF STEVEN GIBBONS; |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment 33: JUDGMENT; |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE JAY B ROOF, DEPT 5; |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE SALLY F. OLSEN, DEPT 8; |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Compelling Discovery 31: ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITIONS &TERMS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.