Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Mackie, Jeffrey Scott, against Doe, I H W, Verwolf, Janet T, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnna M. Laurie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 13: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 12: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 11: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: RAINIER PACIFIC BANK , NFN; |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 10: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE ANNA M. LAURIE, DEPT 3; |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 9: ORDER OF DEFAULT; |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT; | |
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address 8: NOTICE OF ATTY CHANGE OF ADDRESS; |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 7: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & JUDGMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.