Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Woehler, Jason L, against Dowers, Nate, Dowers, Robbie, Nate Dowers Construction Inc, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with William C. Houser presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Houser Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2011 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 16: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; JUDGE WILLIAM C. HOUSER, DEPT 4; |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 15: MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report 14: REPORT - STATUS; |
|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 13: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 12: STIPULATION AGREEMENT; |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING; | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 11: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.