Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Citibank Of South Dakota, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer, P.S., against Ambrose, Edward S, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnna M. Laurie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2010 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 30: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds 29: ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS; JUDGE ANNA M. LAURIE, DEPT 3; |
|
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 28: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 27: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); 10 9 02807 0; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: US DEPT OF DEFENSE , NFN; |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 26: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice 25: NOTICE TO FED GOV GARN DEF; |
|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds 24: ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS; JUDGE M. KARLYNN HABERLY, DEPT 7; |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order 23: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS OBJECTION; TO WAGE GARNISHMENT; JUDGE RUSSELL W. HARTMAN, DEPT 6; |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
M Motion Docket STOP GARNISHMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.