Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Msc3 Miscellaneous - Domestic case in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2009 |
CategoryMsc3 Miscellaneous - Domestic |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Revision
Judge: Hull, Kevin D |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Note for Calendar 11/12/21 AT 9AM - SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken Not Confirmed and Not Heard | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Revision
Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Support CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEETS Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing COURT SIGNS ORDERS AS PRESENTED - COURT RESETS REVISION HEARING TO 11/5/21 AT 2:30PM Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Modification
Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response WITH ATTACHMENT FROM RESPONSIVE DECLARATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.